FL S0092 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 100 (Ch. 2016-184)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the funding source of the principal of the Recovery Fund for the Deepwater Horizon incident; defining the terms "background concentration" and "long-term natural attenuation"; exempting nonprogram petroleum-contaminated sites from the application of risk-based corrective action principles under certain circumstances; providing that institutional controls are not required under certain circumstances if alternative cleanup target levels are used, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contaminated Sites

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-11SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 100 (Ch. 2016-184)
2016-02-11SenateSubstituted CS/HB 351 (Died in House returning Messages)
2016-02-11SenateRead 3rd time
2016-02-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2016-02-10SenateOrdered engrossed
2016-02-10SenateAmendment(s) adopted (834888)
2016-02-10SenateRead 2nd time
2016-02-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16
2016-01-12SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-11-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-11-23SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-11-19SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2015-11-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 11/19/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-10-21SenateNow in Appropriations
2015-10-20SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-10-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 10/20/15, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-10-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2015-10-07SenateFavorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-09-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 10/07/15, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2015-08-19SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2015-08-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0351 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 100 (Ch. 2016-184)
H0851 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1133 (Ch. 2016-99)
S0100 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-184

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1961995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870595Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2888013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
376301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37630701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37679Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37681Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback