FL S0092 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that school districts procure certain types of insurance through interlocal agreements. Requires that each school district in this state enter into a specified type of interlocal agreement and establish the School District Insurance Consortium. Requires the consortium to advertise for competitive bids for health, accident, or hospitalization insurance, as well as certain insurance plans, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Group Insurance for Public Employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 19
2010-11-29 Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 19
2010-11-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0635 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback