FL S0088 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the requirements for the Next Generation Sunshine State Standards to include financial literacy; revising the required credits for a standard high school diploma to include one-half credit of instruction in personal financial literacy and money management and seven and one-half, rather than eight, credits in electives, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High School Graduation Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#874 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in returning Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-09SenateRequested House to recede
2018-03-09SenateRefused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (872419) 1011
2018-03-07SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-07HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 1065
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (872419) 1019
2018-03-06HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 323
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseReceived
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-05HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-01-11HouseIn Messages
2018-01-11SenateImmediately certified
2018-01-11SenateCS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-11SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-09SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18
2017-12-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-12-06SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 12/06/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-11-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-11-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 11/08/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
2017-10-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-10-09SenateCS by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-10-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 10/09/17, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-09-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 09/12/17, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H323 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 88

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback