FL S0086 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Board of Governors of the State University System to create an online dashboard; requiring the procedures to include placing a hold on certain students' registrations; requiring the Board of Governors, the State Board of Education, and the Independent Colleges and Universities of Florida to each approve, by a specified date, a list of career certificate and undergraduate and graduate degree programs that they determine do not lead directly to employment; revising the formula for calculating how Florida Public Student Assistance Grant Program funds are distributed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Financial Aid

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseIn Messages
2021-04-08SenateImmediately certified
2021-04-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 22 NAYS 18
2021-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-07SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-01SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-01SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-31SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 8
2021-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/01/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/31/21, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-23SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
2021-03-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/24/21, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-18SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2021-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/23/21, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-18SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2021-03-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-16SenateCS by Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 4
2021-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/16/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/09/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-24SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2021-02-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H281 (Similar To) 2021-04-09 - Now in Education & Employment Committee
S52 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - In Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100940Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100946Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100950Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100953Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009534Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009893Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Amendment/936858/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Amendment/592876/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Amendment/594362/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Amendment/722026/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Amendment/742634/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Amendment/420832/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Amendment/883824/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Analyses/2021s00086.pre.ed.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Analyses/2021s00086.ed.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Analyses/2021s00086.pre.aed.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Analyses/2021s00086.aed.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Analyses/2021s00086.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Analyses/2021s00086-pcs745108.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Analyses/2021s00086.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/86/Vote/SenateVote_s00086c2007.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback