FL S0084 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adding a minimum population standard as a criteria that must be met before qualified electors of an independent special district commence a certain municipal conversion proceeding, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Conversion of Independent Special Districts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Ethics and Elections; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1244 (Similar To) 2018-02-09 - Now in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1650615Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback