FL S0078 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing honorary designations of certain transportation facilities in specified counties; revising the name of an honorary designation; directing the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers and to examine the feasibility to rename the facilities specified; correcting the location of an honorary designation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation-related Facility Designations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#675 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Approved by Governor
2020-06-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-12SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (546285)
2020-03-11SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (546285)
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-05HouseIn Messages
2020-03-05SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-04SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-04SenateAmendment(s) adopted (282612)
2020-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-27SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2020-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-08-16SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-08-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H21 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H391 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 78 passed
H433 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H815 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S174 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S342 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S382 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S612 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1026 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1046 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1068 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/Amendment/575022/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/Amendment/533900/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/Amendment/335000/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/Amendment/935644/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/Amendment/737782/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/Vote/SenateVote_s00078e1008.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/Vote/HouseVote_s00078e1675.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/78/Vote/SenateVote_s00078e1036.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback