FL S0070 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as "Alyssa's Law"; requiring each public school to implement a mobile panic alert system for specified purposes beginning in a specified school year; authorizing public school districts to implement additional strategies and systems for specified purposes; requiring the Department of Education to issue a competitive solicitation to contract for a mobile panic alert system, subject to appropriation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alert Systems in Public Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#640 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Chapter No. 2020-145
2020-06-30 Approved by Governor
2020-06-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-10SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-10SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-10SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (886033)
2020-03-10SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-09HouseAmendment(s) adopted (886033) 991
2020-03-09HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-06HouseReceived
2020-03-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-06HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateAmendment(s) adopted (530484)
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-05SenateAmendment(s) adopted (658434)
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-28SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-27SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/25/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-22SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-08-16SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-08-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H23 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 70 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/BillText/e3/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/Amendment/925234/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/Amendment/287754/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/Amendment/977336/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/Vote/SenateVote_s00070e1015.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/Vote/HouseVote_s00070e2640.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/70/Vote/SenateVote_s00070e2020.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback