FL S0066 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "drinking water source"; requiring each school district to locate all drinking water sources in certain schools, install a barcode on each source, and install filters that meet certain specifications on all such sources, etc.
Title
Drinking Water in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H545 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/66 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/66/BillText/Filed/HTML |