FL S0064 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3549 (Ch. 2015-217)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3549 (Ch. 2015-217)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Monica Cantillo Acosta and Luis Alberto Cantillo Acosta, the surviving children of Nhora Acosta, by Miami-Dade County; providing for an appropriation to compensate them for the wrongful death of their mother, Ms. Acosta, due to injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of a Miami-Dade County bus driver; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of Monica Cantillo Acosta and Luis Alberto Cantillo Acosta by Miami-Dade County
Sponsors
Sen. John Legg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3549 (Ch. 2015-217) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 3549 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/15, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/07/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Unfavorable by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3549 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-217
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/64 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0064/BillText/Filed/HTML |