FL S0062 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-10 - Chapter No. 2023-320
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-10 - Chapter No. 2023-320
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Robert Earl DuBoise; providing an appropriation to compensate Mr. DuBoise for being wrongfully incarcerated for almost 37 years; prohibiting funds awarded under the act to Mr. DuBoise from being used or paid for specified attorney or lobbying fees; requiring specific reimbursement to the state should a civil award be issued subsequent to Mr. DuBoise's receipt of payment under the act, etc.
Title
Relief of Robert Earl DuBoise by the State of Florida
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#356 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-10 | Chapter No. 2023-320 | |
2023-06-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed; YEAS 105, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Substituted for HB 6005 |
2023-04-25 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/23 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 1 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/21/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/14/23, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2022-12-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6005 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 62 (Ch. 2023-320)