FL S0062 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain awards of attorney fees to certain persons or entities in suits based on claims arising under property insurance policies; requiring an assignee to meet certain requirements as a condition precedent to filing suit under a policy, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assignment of Property Insurance Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7015 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1168 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6277152Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback