FL S0060 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of the Estate of Molly Parker; providing an appropriation to compensate the Estate of Molly Parker for Ms. Parker's death, sustained as result of the negligence of the Department of Transportation; providing a limitation on compensation and the payment of attorney fees, etc.
Title
Relief of the Estate of Molly Parker/Department of Transportation
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/60 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/60/BillText/Filed/HTML |