FL S0060 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to provide that neither house of the Legislature may vote on a bill that would affect access to abortion services unless at least half of the members of that house are women, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bill Affecting Access to Abortion Services/Passage of Bills

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Health Policy
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-08-16SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-08-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H95 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback