FL S0060 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting the sale for human use of diapers, incontinence undergarments, incontinence pads, or incontinence liners from the sales and use tax, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Exemption for Diapers and Incontinence Products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateFavorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-08SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-01-07SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-12-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/07/19, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2018-12-13SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2018-11-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1377 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - Referred to Ways and Means Committee; Appropriations Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback