FL S0060 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reducing the tax levied on rental or license fees charged for the use of real property, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H939 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118
S620 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7087

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback