FL S0060 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Chapter No. 2017-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Chapter No. 2017-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising a pilot program to make it permanent; revising the applicability of the program to include children in out-of-home care; authorizing the program to pay for a child to complete a driver education program and obtain a driver license or the related costs of licensure under certain circumstances; revising a child's transition plan to include options to use in obtaining a driver license under certain circumstances; providing that a guardian ad litem authorized by a minor's caregiver to sign for the minor's learner's driver license does not assume any obligation or liability for damages, etc.
Title
Children Obtaining Driver Licenses
Sponsors
Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Kelli Stargel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#77 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Chapter No. 2017-8 | |
2017-05-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 217 |
2017-03-30 | House | Received |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17 |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | In Messages |
2017-03-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/17 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/16/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/08/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/23/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-11-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0217 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 60 (Ch. 2017-8)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 4091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1454 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |