FL S0060 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3543 (Ch. 2015-215)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3543 (Ch. 2015-215)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for an appropriation to compensate Roy Wright and Ashley Wright, individually and as guardians of Tucker Wright, for injuries and damages sustained by Tucker Wright as a result of the negligence of Parrish Medical Center; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs; providing that certain payments and the appropriation satisfy all present and future claims related to the negligent act, etc.
Title
Relief of Roy Wright and Ashley Wright by the North Brevard County Hospital District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3543 (Ch. 2015-215) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 3543 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/17/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3543 (Similar To) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-215