FL S0056 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 241
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Management Services to provide coverage and payment through state employee group health insurance contracts for certain annual skin cancer screenings, without imposing a cost-sharing requirement; specifying a requirement for and a restriction on payments for such screenings, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coverage for Skin Cancer Screenings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-01SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 241
2024-03-01SenateSubstituted CS/HB 241
2024-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2024-02-28SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
2024-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-02-22SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2024-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2024-02-13SenateNow in Appropriations
2024-02-13SenateFavorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2024-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2024-01-24SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2024-01-24SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2024-01-24SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2024-01-24SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Policy
2024-01-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-01-22SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2024-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2023-10-10SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
2023-09-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H241 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - Chapter No. 2024-63

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11012303Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Amendment/408314/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Analyses/2024s00056.pre.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Analyses/2024s00056.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Analyses/2024s00056.pre.aeg.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Analyses/2024s00056.aeg.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Analyses/2024s00056.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Analyses/2024s00056.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Vote/2024-01-22%200400PM~S00056%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Vote/2024-02-13%200830AM~S00056%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/56/Vote/2024-02-22%201200PM~S00056%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback