FL S0052 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting the expiration of a requirement for the Agency for Health Care Administration to make payments for Medicaid-covered services for certain persons based on specified retroactive eligibility timeframes, etc.
Title
Medicaid Services
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/29/20, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/28/20, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5201 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations