FL S0052 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3533 (Ch. 2015-214)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3533 (Ch. 2015-214)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Criss Matute, Christian Manuel Torres, Eddna Torres De Mayne, Lansky Torres, and Nasdry Yamileth Torres Barahona, as beneficiaries of the Estate of Manuel Antonio Matute, by the Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office; providing for an appropriation to compensate them for the wrongful death of their father, Manuel Antonio Matute, as a result of the negligence of an employee of the Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office; providing that the amount paid by the sheriff's office and the appropriation satisfy all present and future claims related to the negligent act; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of the Estate of Manuel Antonio Matute by the Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Negron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3533 (Ch. 2015-214) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 3533 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/05/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/03/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3533 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-214
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/52 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0052/BillText/Filed/HTML |