FL S0044 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the authorized uses of drones by law enforcement agencies and other specified entities for specified purposes; requiring the Department of Management Services, in consultation with a specified officer, to publish a list of approved drone manufacturers meeting specified security standards; requiring governmental agencies to discontinue the use of specified drones by a certain date; requiring the department to establish minimum security standards for governmental agency drone use, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of Drones by Government Agencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#300 (Y: 88 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2021-04-28SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-28SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (892017)
2021-04-26HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-26SenateIn returning messages
2021-04-26HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 88, NAYS 24
2021-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-23HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-23HouseAmendment 892017 adopted
2021-04-23HouseAmendment 090057 withdrawn
2021-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 1049
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 090057 filed
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 892017 filed
2021-04-20House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-20HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/23/2021)
2021-04-20HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-03-18HouseIn Messages
2021-03-18SenateImmediately certified
2021-03-18SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 262
2021-03-18SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-18SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-15SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/18/21
2021-03-10SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2021-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-04SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-03-02SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/04/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-02-17SenateNow in Rules
2021-02-16SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/16/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-01-28SenateNow in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2021-01-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-01-26SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-01-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/26/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
2020-12-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S518 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
H433 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table
H1049 (Similar To) 2021-04-23 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 44

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93450Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Amendment/516022/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Amendment/892017/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Amendment/090057/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Analyses/2021s00044.pre.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Analyses/2021s00044.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Analyses/2021s00044.pre.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Analyses/2021s00044.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Analyses/2021s00044.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Analyses/2021s00044.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Analyses/2021s00044.hms.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Vote/SenateVote_s00044c2012.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Vote/HouseVote_s00044c2300.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Vote/SenateVote_s00044c2009.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Vote/2021-01-26%200900AM~S00044%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Vote/2021-02-16%201230PM~S00044%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/44/Vote/2021-03-04%200900AM~S00044%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback