FL S0038 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Providing for an appropriation to compensate Erin Joynt for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of Volusia County; providing that certain payments and the appropriation satisfy all present and future claims related to the negligent act, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relief of Erin Joynt by Volusia County



2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-10-25SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2017-10-24SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 10/24/17, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-10-16SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-10-16SenateRecommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules

Same As/Similar To

H6537 (Same As) 2018-01-18 - Unfavorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, laid on Table; YEAS 4 NAYS 11
H6539 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments