FL S0032 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Chapter No. 2023-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded; replacing incorrect cross-references and citations; correcting grammatical, typographical, and like errors; removing inconsistencies, redundancies, and unnecessary repetition in the statutes; and improving the clarity of the statutes and facilitating their correct interpretation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27 Chapter No. 2023-8
2023-03-24 Approved by Governor
2023-03-22 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2023-03-17SenateOrdered enrolled
2023-03-17HousePassed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
2023-03-17HouseRead 3rd time
2023-03-16HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2023-03-16HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2023-03-16HouseRead 2nd time
2023-03-16HouseSubstituted for HB 7011
2023-03-13House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-03-13HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/16/2023)
2023-03-13HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2023-03-09HouseIn Messages
2023-03-08SenateImmediately certified
2023-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2023-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2023-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/23
2023-02-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-02-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2023-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Rules
2023-02-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7011 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 32 (Ch. 2023-8)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100160Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10023105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002394Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003575Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100443Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004447Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10046496Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100479Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10060626Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10061493Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100628Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100673Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100824Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100847Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009286Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100989Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10169Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10122315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
110123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
110501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1120455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123187Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112353Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112361Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11634Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1250104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
125488Amended CodeSee Bill Text
142019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15947Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1671Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16332051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1660484Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
185221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2155551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
251001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282457Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2950185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
295061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
331303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3313101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3320075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3730363Amended CodeSee Bill Text
377814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3792273Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394459Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091664Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4092557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4092564Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4141251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
415102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
441011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497260Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
553895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62436Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269891Amended CodeSee Bill Text
695031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
741313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
815062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8343Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
905015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
907044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
946502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9600021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98526Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback