FL S0032 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Donald Brown by the District School Board of Sumter County; providing an appropriation to compensate Donald Brown for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of the District School Board of Sumter County; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs; providing that certain payments and the appropriation satisfies all present and future claims related to the negligent act, etc.
Title
Relief of Donald Brown by the District School Board of Sumter County
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2014-07-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3515 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/32 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0032/BillText/Filed/HTML |