FL S0030 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-236
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-236
Summary
Compensates Lois H. Lacava for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of the Munroe Regional Medical Center. Provides a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM: $250,000.
Title
Relief/Lois Lacava/Munroe Regional Health System [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Chapter No. 2010-236 | |
2010-06-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991 | |
2010-04-28 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01229; CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 3 -HJ 01229 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01174; Substituted for CS/HB 1303 -HJ 01174 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -HJ 01093; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01093 | |
2010-04-16 | In Messages | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00591; Read 3rd time -SJ 00591; CS passed; YEAS 31 NAYS 4 -SJ 00591 | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00191 | |
2010-03-10 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-09 | CS by- Health Regulation; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 -SJ 00191; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00234 | |
2010-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/09/10, 3:30 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to The Special Master on Claim Bills; Health Regulation -SJ 00015; Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by The Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 00163; Now in Health Regulation -SJ 00163 | |
2010-02-18 | Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by The Special Master on Claim Bills; Now in Health Regulation | |
2010-02-16 | References corrected to The Special Master on Claim Bills; Health Regulation | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to The Special Master on Claim Bills | |
2009-07-31 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1303 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 30; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 30 (Ch. 2010-236) -HJ 01174
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0030&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010 |