FL S0028 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6527
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Christopher Cannon; providing an appropriation to compensate him for injuries and damages sustained as a result of the alleged negligence of the City of Tallahassee, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Christopher Cannon by the City of Tallahassee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6527
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted CS/HB 6527
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time 789
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-20SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-20SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/20/18, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-02-15SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-02-14SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-02-14SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-13SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-08SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-08SenateRecommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-08-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6527 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-192

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback