FL S0024 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Clinton Treadway; providing an appropriation and certain benefits to compensate Clinton Treadway for being wrongfully incarcerated for 7 years and 25 days; requiring the Department of Legal Affairs and the Department of Law Enforcement to immediately expunge Clinton Treadway's criminal record arising from his wrongful incarceration; providing that certain benefits and the appropriation satisfy all present and future claims related to the wrongful arrest, conviction, and incarceration of Clinton Treadway, etc.
Title
Relief of Clinton Treadway by the State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3507 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/24 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0024/BillText/Filed/HTML |