FL S0024 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of L.T., a minor; providing an appropriation to compensate L.T., a minor, by and through Vicki McSwain, the Permanent Custodian for L.T., for injuries and damages sustained as a result of the negligence of employees of the Department of Children and Families, formerly known as the Department of Children and Family Services; providing a limitation of the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief of L.T., a Minor, by the Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations; Rules |
2012-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0541 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Select Committee on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/24 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0024/BillText/Filed/HTML |