FL S0020 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Compensates the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa for Dr. Aversa's death as a result of the negligence of the Department of Transportation. Requires the Executive Office of the Governor to establish spending authority from unappropriated trust fund balances of the department for compensation to the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa. Provides for attorney's fees and costs. Provides a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief/Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa/DOT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 16 | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 16 | |
2010-08-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0687 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/20 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0020/BillText/Filed/HTML |