FL S0014 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Dennis Darling, Sr., and Wendy Smith, parents of Devaughn Darling, deceased; providing an appropriation from the General Revenue Fund to compensate the parents for the loss of their son, Devaughn Darling, whose death occurred while he was engaged in football preseason training on the Florida State University campus; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief of Dennis Darling, Sr. and Wendy Smith by the State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Education; Appropriations; Rules |
2012-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0597 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Select Committee on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/14 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0014/BillText/Filed/HTML |