FL S0012 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Compensates Charles Pandrea, husband of Janet Pandrea, for the death of Janet Pandrea as a result of the negligence of the North Broward Hospital District. Provides a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Pandrea/North Broward Hospital District

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 15
2011-01-18 Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 16
2010-08-02 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0841 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback