FL S0006 | 2022 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Chapter No. 2022-267
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Chapter No. 2022-267
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "social media platform", etc.
Title
Social Media Platforms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#904 (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Chapter No. 2022-267 | |
2022-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-04-21 | House | Passed; YEAS 70, NAYS 38 |
2022-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-04-20 | House | Substituted for HB 5C |
2022-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-04-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-04-20 | House | In Messages |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 24 NAYS 15 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (778976) |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/22 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/19/22, 2:30 pm, 117 Knott Building |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5 (Same As) 2022-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 6-C (Ch. 2022-267)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 2041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |