FL S0006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Chapter No. 2019-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting provisions which have become inoperative by noncurrent repeal or expiration and, pursuant to s. 11.242(5)(b) and (i), F.S., may be omitted from the 2019 Florida Statutes only through a reviser's bill duly enacted by the Legislature, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04 Chapter No. 2019-4
2019-04-03 Approved by Governor
2019-03-29 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-03-27SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-03-21HousePassed; YEAS 108 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-20HouseSubstituted for HB 7043
2019-03-14HouseReceived
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-03-07HouseIn Messages
2019-03-07SenateImmediately certified
2019-03-07SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/19
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-02-20SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Rules
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7043 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100846Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160898Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37724075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9327055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
961055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
961056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9856865Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback