FL S0006 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reducing the tax levied on rental or license fees charged for the use of real property; providing for construction of the act in pari materia with laws enacted during the 2015 Regular Session of the Legislature, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenateDied in Appropriations
2015-06-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateIntroduced
2015-06-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0033 (Similar To) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-221

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback