FL S0004 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Florida Excellence in Higher Education Act of 2018"; revising the preeminent state research universities program graduation rate requirements and funding distributions; authorizing a public institution of higher education to create and enforce certain restrictions relating to expressive activities on campus; providing for the future repeal of provisions relating to the University of South Florida St. Petersburg and Sarasota/Manatee, respectively; establishing the World Class Faculty and Scholar Program; establishing the State University Professional and Graduate Degree Excellence Program; authorizing students to use certain Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program awards for summer term enrollment beginning in specified years under certain circumstances; extending coverage of the Benacquisto Scholarship Program to include tuition and fees for qualified nonresident students, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#783 (Y: 84 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#782 (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#781 (Y: 37 N: 75 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12 Chapter No. 2018-4
2018-03-11 Approved by Governor
2018-03-06 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-05SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-05SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 5
2018-03-05SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (843425) 716
2018-03-05SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) failed (104550, 709462)
2018-03-05SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 84 NAYS 28 875
2018-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (843425)
2018-03-05HouseAmendment(s) failed (511359)
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time 866
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-02HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 423
2018-02-27HouseReceived 684
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-01-11HouseIn Messages
2018-01-11SenateImmediately certified
2018-01-11SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-11SenateAmendment(s) failed (398480)
2018-01-11SenateAmendment(s) adopted (526604, 662816)
2018-01-11SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-09SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18
2017-12-12SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-12-08SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-06SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 12/06/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-11-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-11-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education, 11/08/17, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education
2017-10-09SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-10-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 10/09/17, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-09-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 09/12/17, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2017-08-30SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations
2017-08-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H423 (Same As) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 4
S540 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H831 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
S1752 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
H909 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1234 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10017065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004097Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100434Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004344Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10046497Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10046498Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100830Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100922Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100953Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009534Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009893Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009894Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100998Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/Amendment/312532/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/Amendment/526604/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/Amendment/662816/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/Amendment/398480/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/Vote/SenateVote_s00004c1002.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/Vote/HouseVote_s00004e1781.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/Vote/HouseVote_s00004e1782.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/Vote/HouseVote_s00004e1783.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4/Vote/SenateVote_s00004e1023.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback