FL S0004 | 2017 | Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-09 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Providing moneys for the annual period beginning July 1, 2017, and ending June 30, 2018, to fund the state Medicaid program; incorporating by reference certain calculations of the Medicaid Disproportionate Share Hospital and Hospital Reimbursement programs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental Appropriations for Medicaid Hospital Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateDied on Calendar
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-06-08SenateOrdered engrossed
2017-06-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (933860)
2017-06-08SenateRead 2nd time
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/08/17
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-06-08SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2017-06-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 06/08/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-06-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 06/07/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop
2017-06-07SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-06-07SenateIntroduced
2017-06-07SenateConsidered outside purview of the Call
2017-06-07SenateIntroduction allowed
2017-06-06SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback