FL S0002 | 2017 | Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1-A (Ch. 2017-233)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Florida Job Growth Grant Fund within the Department of Economic Opportunity; providing eligibility criteria for projects to receive funds from the Florida Job Growth Grant Fund; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to retain state funds for specified programs in the State Economic Enhancement and Development Trust Fund until certain conditions are met; creating the Targeted Marketing Assistance Program to enhance the tourism business marketing of small, minority, rural, and agritourism businesses in the state; terminating the Displaced Homemaker Trust Fund within the Department of Economic Opportunity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1-A (Ch. 2017-233)
2017-06-09SenateSubstituted HB 1-A
2017-06-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-06-08SenateOrdered engrossed
2017-06-08SenateAmendment(s) failed (117684, 860238) 53
2017-06-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (293618, 635320, 778464, 911692) 52, 53
2017-06-08SenateRead 2nd time
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/08/17
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-06-08SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2017-06-08SenateFavorable with 4 amendment(s) by- Appropriations (635320, 293618, 778464, 911692); YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2017-06-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 06/08/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-06-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-06-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2017-06-07SenateFavorable with 2 amendment(s) by Commerce and Tourism (860238, 305400); YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2017-06-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 06/07/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-06-07SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
2017-06-07SenateIntroduced
2017-06-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-233

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
187201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28812266Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28892Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44652Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
741011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/BillText/e1/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/741856/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/305400/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/860238/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/729180/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/456320/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/518784/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/355900/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/635320/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/293618/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/778464/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/911692/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2A/Amendment/117684/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback