FL S0002 | 2014 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Chapter No. 2014-255
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the state's congressional districts; providing for the inclusion of unlisted territory in contiguous districts; providing for the inclusion of noncontiguous territory; providing that new counties become part of the congressional district in which the territory for such new county is located; providing for the election of representatives to the United States House of Representatives; providing that an appointment made pursuant to former district boundaries is unaffected by new district boundaries, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Congressional Districts of the State

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-13 Chapter No. 2014-255
2014-08-13 Approved by Governor
2014-08-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2014-08-11SenateOrdered enrolled
2014-08-11HousePassed; YEAS 71 NAYS 38
2014-08-11HouseRead 3rd time
2014-08-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2014-08-11HouseRead 2nd time
2014-08-11HouseReceived
2014-08-11HouseIn Messages
2014-08-11SenateImmediately certified
2014-08-11SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 25 NAYS 12
2014-08-11SenateRead 3rd time
2014-08-11SenateAmendment(s) adopted (642398)
2014-08-11SenateRead 2nd time
2014-08-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 08/11/14
2014-08-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2014-08-08SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2014-08-08SenateFavorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Reapportionment (726240); YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2014-08-07SenateIntroduced
2014-08-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Reapportionment, 08/08/14, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building
2014-08-05SenateReferred to Reapportionment
2014-08-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0001 (Similar To) 2014-08-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2-A (Ch. 2014-255)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
807Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/2A
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/Amendment/726240/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/Amendment/343704/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/Amendment/206064/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/Amendment/799380/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/Amendment/837096/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/Amendment/642398/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/Amendment/599060/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014A/0002A/Amendment/671078/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback