FL H9421 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 2425A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 2425A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Nettle Ridge Volunteer Fire Department Fire Truck.
Title
Nettle Ridge Volunteer Fire Department Fire Truck
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 2425A) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |