FL H9403 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
Pending: House Infrastructure and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 3:30 pm House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Wakulla County New Library Facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wakulla County New Library Facility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-12HouseNow in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-08HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback