FL H9401 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Wakulla County Public Safety Facility.
Title
Wakulla County Public Safety Facility
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |