FL H9357 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 9:00 am House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Bristol Water System Improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bristol Water System Improvements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HouseAdded to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-12HouseNow in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-08HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback