FL H9217 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 30B)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 30B)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Manatee Technical College - Law Enforcement Firing Range & Driving Facility.
Title
Manatee Technical College - Law Enforcement Firing Range & Driving Facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 30B) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-07 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/9217 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/9217/BillText/Filed/PDF |