FL H9215 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
Pending: House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 4:30 pm House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the UF Health Alzheimer's and Dementia Research.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UF Health Alzheimer's and Dementia Research

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13HouseAdded to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-29HouseNow in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-29HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-12-29HouseReferred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-28HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback