FL H9197 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Security Funding for Accredited Nonpublic Schools.
Title
Security Funding for Accredited Nonpublic Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-03 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/9197 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/9197/BillText/Filed/PDF |