FL H9119 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the LiFT Academy/University Transition Program/Fast Forward and Reading Assistant Plus Software.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LiFT Academy/University Transition Program/Fast Forward and Reading Assistant Plus Software

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-04HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 114)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-13HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-27HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback