FL H9067 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died, reference deferred, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 2838 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Commends UF Men's Indoor Track & Field Team for winning 2010 Division I Men's Indoor Track & Field Team NCAA Championship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UF Men's Indoor Track and Field Team

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died, reference deferred, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 2838 (Adopted)
2010-04-09 Introduced -HJ 00652
2010-04-08 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2838 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Introduced -SJ 00590; Read 2nd time -SJ 00590; Adopted -SJ 00590

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback