FL H9035 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1665A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1665A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Riviera Beach Rehabilitation of Existing Wells and Construction of New Wells.
Title
Riviera Beach Rehabilitation of Existing Wells and Construction of New Wells
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1665A) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-19 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-22 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Filed |