FL H9027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the University of South Florida St. Petersburg - Joint Institute for Gulf of Mexico Studies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of South Florida St. Petersburg - Joint Institute for Gulf of Mexico Studies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-24HouseReferred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback