FL H9009 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only; Read 2nd time -HJ 00675; Adopted; companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1670 (Adopted) -HJ 00675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only; Read 2nd time -HJ 00675; Adopted; companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1670 (Adopted) -HJ 00675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commends osteopathic physicians of this state & designates April 14, 2010, as "Osteopathic Medicine Day" in Florida.
Title
Osteopathic Medicine Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only; Read 2nd time -HJ 00675; Adopted; companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1670 (Adopted) -HJ 00675 | |
2010-03-04 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00215 |
Same As/Similar To
S1670 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Introduced -SJ 00577; Read 2nd time -SJ 00577; Adopted; companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9009 (Adopted) -SJ 00577